This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2018 08:32:00

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/15/2009 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by WANG, KEVIN against DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number 09SX2086
  • Filing Date 10/15/2009
  • Case Status Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type Small Claim - Other Small Claim
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU
  • Courthouse Inglewood Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff WANG KEVIN
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant DEL ROSARIO EDUARDO RAZO
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013
  • 04/27/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE
  • 04/27/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM LAW09W02086 TO ING09SX2086
  • 01/29/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .
  • 01/29/2010
  • CASE RESTORED TO ACTIVE STATUS FOR THE FOLLOWING ADMINISTRATIVE REASON{S}: DISMISSAL WAS VACATED.
  • 01/29/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .
  • 01/29/2010
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 01/29/10 . FOR (WANG, KEVIN) . AGAINST (DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO) . PRINCIPAL $ 7500.00 . COSTS $ 105.00 . TOTAL $ 7605.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.
  • 12/24/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING RETURNED AS TO (WANG, KEVIN) DUE TO NO EXPLANATION PROVIDED .
  • 12/23/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/29/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . COSTS OF $30.00.
  • 12/18/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.
  • 12/18/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.
  • 12/14/2009
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 01/29/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .
  • 12/08/2009
  • RE: ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT. . ON COURT'S OWN MOTION JUDGMENT ORDERED ON 12/4/2009 IS NOW VACATED DUE TO INCOMPLETE PROOF OF SERVICE. PLAINTIFF IS TO APPEAR IN CLERK'S OFFICE BY 12/18/2009 TO RESET HEARING OR THE CASE WILL BE DISMISSED. . CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.
  • 12/08/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PROOF OF SERVICE INCOMPLETE. JUDGMENT ORDERED VACATED. PLAINTIFF TO RESET HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 12/18/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .
  • 12/08/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.
  • 12/08/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM DEPT. 92 .
  • 12/07/2009
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO) .
  • 10/15/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1091016E3365. HEARING SET FOR 12/04/09 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 092.
  • 10/15/2009
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO)