This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2019 at 07:03:17 (UTC).

Johnson v. Monaco et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Monaco. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-06419

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Johnson

Defendants

Denise Monaco

Mimi D. Monaco

DOES 1-10,

Foreland Parts, Inc.

Kenneth Cox

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Chris Carson

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Brent F. Basilico

Attorney at Furukawa Castles LLP

800 Airport Blvd, Suite 504, Burlingame

Burlingame, CA 94010

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#9

(#9) Defendant Foreland Parts, Inc. dba Napa Auto Parts' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byForeland Parts, Inc.. (Basilico, Brent) (Filed on 11/18/2019) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Kenneth Cox served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 10/29/2019) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Mimi D. Monaco served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 12/2/2019) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13772566.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

5 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Foreland Parts, Inc. served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 11/19/2019) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Kenneth Cox, Foreland Parts, Inc., Denise Monaco, Mimi D. Monaco. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Mimi D. Monaco served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 12/2/2019) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Foreland Parts, Inc. served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 11/19/2019) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendant Foreland Parts, Inc. dba Napa Auto Parts' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byForeland Parts, Inc.. (Basilico, Brent) (Filed on 11/18/2019) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Kenneth Cox served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 10/29/2019) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Kenneth Cox, Foreland Parts, Inc., Denise Monaco, Mimi D. Monaco. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13772566.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less