This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2019 07:38:27

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality case was filed by Adeyinka against Barrs in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Oregon District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 3:19-cv-00943
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Youlee Yim You
  • Courthouse Oregon District

Party Details

  • Defendant Brady Barrs
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Ms. Armstong
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Texas Department of Justice
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Defendant C. Aquilera
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Sho...

Fees Apply
#7

(#7) Order to Show Cause. Signed on 7/18/2019 by Magistrate ...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) Notice titled "Amendment Claim". Filed by Emmanuel Adew...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) Exhibits re Complaint #2 . Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Ad...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Mag...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Emmanuel Ad...

Fees Apply
2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Emmanuel...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • (#9) ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause #8 . In his motion, plaintiff does not specify how much time he is seeking, but states generally that he intends to travel to Houston, Texas, to obtain documents regarding his parole and sex offender registration. As explained in the Order to Show Cause #7 , plaintiff's allegations against Texas defendants are not properly before this court. However, because plaintiff is a pro se litigant, this court grants an extension until August 15, 2019, for plaintiff to respond to the Order to Show Cause or file an amended complaint curing the defects identified in said order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/1/2019.) (pvh) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
  • 07/31/2019
  • (#8) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause #7 . Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
  • 07/18/2019
  • (#7) Order to Show Cause. Signed on 7/18/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/18/2019.) (pvh) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#6) Notice titled "Amendment Claim". Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
  • 06/18/2019
  • (#5) Exhibits re Complaint #2 . Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#4) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/14/2019.) (joha) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#3) Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#2) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka against C. Aquilera, Armstong, Brady Barrs, Texas Department of Justice (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 06/14/2019)