This case was last updated from PACER on 06/24/2020 at 05:20:05 (UTC).

Katz v. Allied Medical Technology, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 Katz filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Allied Medical Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sallie Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-04128

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sallie Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Katz

Defendant

Allied Medical Technology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adrian R. Bacon

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.

21550 Oxnard Street, Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Todd Michael Friedman

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.

21550 Oxnard Street, Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Defendant Allied Medical Technology, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 6/22/2020) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF: (1) Negligent Violations of the Telephone Consumer Protection Act [47 U.S.C. Section 227 et seq.]; (2) Willful Violations of the Telephone Consumer Protection Act [47 U.S.C. Section 227 et seq.]; Demand for Jury Trial against Allied Medical Technology, Inc., (Filing Fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-14609598). Filed by Jeffrey Katz. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 6/22/2020) Modified on 6/23/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Defendant Allied Medical Technology, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/7/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 6/22/2020) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF: (1) Negligent Violations of the Telephone Consumer Protection Act [47 U.S.C. Section 227 et seq.]; (2) Willful Violations of the Telephone Consumer Protection Act [47 U.S.C. Section 227 et seq.]; Demand for Jury Trial against Allied Medical Technology, Inc., (Filing Fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-14609598). Filed by Jeffrey Katz. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 6/22/2020) Modified on 6/23/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less