This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2020 at 07:17:00 (UTC).

CONCORDIA PARTNERS LLC v. PICK et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2013 CONCORDIA PARTNERS LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against PICK. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III and GEORGE Z. SINGAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:13-CV-00415

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judge

GEORGE Z. SINGAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

CONCORDIA PARTNERS LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

MARCELLE PICK

PICK ENTERPRISES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

STACY O. STITHAM

Attorney at BRANN & ISAACSON

184 Main Street, P.O. Box 3070

Lewiston, ME 04243

DAVID BERTONI

Attorney at BRANN & ISAACSON

184 Main Street, P.O. Box 3070, 786-3566

Lewiston, ME 04243

DANIEL A. NUZZI

Attorney at BRANN & ISAACSON

184 Main Street, P.O. Box 3070, 786-3566, Fax: 783-9325

Lewiston, ME 04243

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

JAMES D. POLIQUIN

Attorney at NORMAN, HANSON & DETROY

Two Canal Plaza, P. O. Box 4600, 774-7000

Portland, ME 04112

PETER J. DETROY, III

Two Canal Plaza, P. O. Box 4600

Portland, ME 04112

ELLIOTT L. EPSTEIN

Attorney at OWEN PICKUS, D.O. ESQ. & ASSOCIATES

2 Storer Street, Suite 200A

Kennebunk, ME 04043

THEODORE H. KIRCHNER

Two Canal Plaza, P. O. Box 4600, 774-7000

Portland, ME 04112

 

Court Documents

#72

(#72) Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by CONCORDIA PARTNERS LLC Responses due by 10/3/2014. (STITHAM, STACY) (Entered: 09/12/2014)

56 #68

Exhibit G62 - Copyright application for article "Health & vitamins

56 #67

Exhibit G61 - Copyright application for article "Good news about s

56 #64

Exhibit G58 - Copyright application for article "Food and herbs for

56 #62

Exhibit G56 - Copyright application for article "Feel better in two

56 #61

Exhibit G55 - Copyright application for article "Emotional well bei

56 #60

Exhibit G54 - Copyright application for article "Eat safe - six sim

56 #59

Exhibit G53 - Copyright application for article "Dual energy x-ray

#56

(#71) Reply to #56 Amended Counterclaim by CONCORDIA PARTNERS LLC. (STITHAM, STACY) Modified on 8/21/2014 to clean up docket text (lrc). (Entered: 08/21/2014)

1 #8

Exhibit H 10-30-13 cease and desist letter

1 #7

Exhibit G 10-28-13 cease and desist letter

1 #6

Exhibit F 2013 WHN website application

1 #5

Exhibit E 2013 W2W website application

1 #4

Exhibit D 2009 W2W website application

1 #3

Exhibit C 41 copyright registration apps

1 #2

Exhibit B List of 41 Concordia copyright Apps

1 #1

Exhibit A 2006 license agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MARCELLE PICK, PICK ENTERPRISES LLC with Jury Demand IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD, COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO IMMEDIATELY LOGIN TO CM/ECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY.IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CHECK, THE COURT REQUIRES RECEIPT OF PAYMENT WITHIN 48 HOURS OF THIS FILING., filed by CONCORDIA PARTNERS LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 3/10/2014) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 2006 license agreement, #2 Exhibit B List of 41 Concordia copyright Apps, #3 Exhibit C 41 copyright registration apps, #4 Exhibit D 2009 W2W website application, #5 Exhibit E 2013 W2W website application, #6 Exhibit F 2013 WHN website application, #7 Exhibit G 10-28-13 cease and desist letter, #8 Exhibit H 10-30-13 cease and desist letter)(bfa) (Entered: 11/12/2013)

266 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2015
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding 75 Discovery Hearing held: This entry was marked as FILED IN ERROR. Please see consolidated case 2:14-cv-9-GZS for proper entry. (mlm) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Docket(#75) **FILED IN ERROR** Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III: Discovery Hearing held; report and order to follow. (Court Reporter: No court reporter present) (RICH III, JOHN) Modified on 5/26/2015 to indicate error; see case 2:14-cv-9 (mlm). (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Docket(#74) NOTICE- Please be advised that this case has been consolidated with case number 2:14-cv-09-GZS. All further filings must be made in lead case number 2:14-cv-09-GZS. (lrc) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ORDER granting without objection #72 Motion to Consolidate Cases. GRANTED WITHOUT OBJECTION. District of Maine Docket # 2:14-cv-09-GZS shall become the lead case. SO ORDERED. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by CONCORDIA PARTNERS LLC Responses due by 10/3/2014. (STITHAM, STACY) (Entered: 09/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Reply to #56 Amended Counterclaim by CONCORDIA PARTNERS LLC. (STITHAM, STACY) Modified on 8/21/2014 to clean up docket text (lrc). (Entered: 08/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) ORDER granting #69 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 4/10/2015. Discovery due by 3/27/2015. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc) (Entered: 08/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by CONCORDIA PARTNERS LLC Responses due by 9/10/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(STITHAM, STACY) (Entered: 08/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • DocketSet Deadlines per Report of Hearing and Order Re: Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Dates (ECF No. 66) and Order on Motion to Remand being entered in Case No. 2:14-cv-09-GZS: Counsel shall file any objections to the Scheduling Order and any proposed discovery plan by 8/21/2014. (lrc) (Entered: 08/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) ORDER granting #67 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Epstein's representation of the defendants is hereby terminated; the defendants continue to be represented by Attorneys Poliquin, DeTroy, and Kirchner. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN) (Entered: 02/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketSet Deadlines pursuant to the ORDER ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER entered on 11/12/2013: Plaintiff shall file with the Court a copy of the state court complaint, the state court docket and any orders issued by the state court hearing that case as well as a brief summary of the status of that litigation no later than NOON on 11/15/2013. (lrc) (Entered: 11/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER denying #3 Motion for TRO; reserving ruling #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc) (Entered: 11/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CONCORDIA PARTNERS LLC. (NUZZI, DANIEL) (Entered: 11/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Notification to Defendants of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction and Exhibits and Complaint and Exhibits pursuant to Fed. R. 65(c) by CONCORDIA PARTNERS LLC (NUZZI, DANIEL) (Entered: 11/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; copy e-mailed to U.S Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 copyright applications, #2 copyright registration applications) (bfa) (Entered: 11/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to MARCELLE PICK, PICK ENTERPRISES LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Pick Enterprises summons)(bfa) (Entered: 11/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1185997.), filed by CONCORDIA PARTNERS LLC.(NUZZI, DANIEL) (Entered: 11/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction by CONCORDIA PARTNERS LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff Mckinnon, #2 Declaration of Jeff McKinnon in support of TRO Ex. A, #3 Declaration of Richard Bilodeau, #4 Bilodeau Declaration Ex. A 10-28-13 cease and desist letter, #5 Bilodeau Declaration Ex. B 10-30-13 cease and desist letter, #6 Bilodeau Declaration Ex. C 2009 W2W website application, #7 Bilodeau Declaration Ex. D 2013 W2W website application, #8 Bilodeau Declaration Ex. E 2013 WHN website application, #9 Bilodeau Declaration Ex. F1-F41, #10 Bilodeau Declaration Ex. G List of 41 Concordia copyright apps, #11 Bilodeau Declaration Ex. H1-21a&b, #12 Bilodeau Declaration Ex. H22 - 41 a&b, #13 Bilodeau Declaration Ex.I CopyScape Report, #14 Bilodeau Declaration Ex. J Concordia websites features listing)(bfa). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 11/12/2013 (lrc). (Entered: 11/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 11/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MARCELLE PICK, PICK ENTERPRISES LLC with Jury Demand IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD, COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO IMMEDIATELY LOGIN TO CM/ECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY.IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CHECK, THE COURT REQUIRES RECEIPT OF PAYMENT WITHIN 48 HOURS OF THIS FILING., filed by CONCORDIA PARTNERS LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 3/10/2014) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 2006 license agreement, #2 Exhibit B List of 41 Concordia copyright Apps, #3 Exhibit C 41 copyright registration apps, #4 Exhibit D 2009 W2W website application, #5 Exhibit E 2013 W2W website application, #6 Exhibit F 2013 WHN website application, #7 Exhibit G 10-28-13 cease and desist letter, #8 Exhibit H 10-30-13 cease and desist letter)(bfa) (Entered: 11/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less