This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:39:57 (UTC).

Bratton v. Maury County Government

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Bratton filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Maury County Government. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbara D. Holmes and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00096

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randy Bratton

Defendant

Maury County Government

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paige M. Lyle

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

Heather M. Collins

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

Anne Hunter

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

Defendant Attorney

Robyn Beale Williams

Attorney at Farrar & Bates, LLP

211 Seventh Avenue, North, Suite 500

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Maury County Government.(Williams, Robyn) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Beale Williams on behalf of Maury County Government (Williams, Robyn) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS returned executed by Randy Bratton. (Hunter, Anne) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paige M. Lyle terminated. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/20/2019. (mg) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Randy Bratton. Maury County Government served on 12/19/2019. (Hunter, Anne) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Paige M. Lyle by Randy Bratton. (Lyle, Paige) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/9/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 11:30 AM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons issued as to Maury County Government. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) Modified on 12/9/2019 (mg). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Maury County Government (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3045340), filed by Randy Bratton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Maury County Government.(Williams, Robyn) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Robyn Beale Williams. (mg) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Beale Williams on behalf of Maury County Government (Williams, Robyn) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS returned executed by Randy Bratton. (Hunter, Anne) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paige M. Lyle terminated. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/20/2019. (mg) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Randy Bratton. Maury County Government served on 12/19/2019. (Hunter, Anne) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket**DISREGARD**NOTICE TO FILER re DE# 19 : The incorrect PDF was filed. This document is disregarded. Counsel shall re-file the document. (am) Modified on 12/19/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Paige M. Lyle by Randy Bratton. (Lyle, Paige) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/9/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 11:30 AM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons issued as to Maury County Government. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) Modified on 12/9/2019 (mg). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Heather M. Collins, Anne Hunter, and Paige M. Lyle. (mg) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Maury County Government (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3045340), filed by Randy Bratton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less