Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 08:39:53 (UTC).

Diane Benton et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Diane Benton filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against National Railroad Passenger Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish and Virginia A. Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-09830

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dianne Benton

David Benton

Defendant

National Railroad Passenger Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James McCallion

Attorney at Carpenter Zuckerman and Rowley

407 Bryant Circle Suite F

Ojai, CA 93023

Thomas Gregory Adams

Attorney at Carpenter Zuckerman and Rowley

407 Bryant Circle Suite F

Ojai, CA 93023

Defendant Attorney

Derrick Lam

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

633 West 5Th Street 63Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation answer now due 1/23/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Attorney Derrick Lam added to party National Railroad Passenger Corporation(pty:dft))(Lam, Derrick) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#9

(#9) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Dianne Benton, David Benton, upon Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Adams, Thomas) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#7

(#7) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (lh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (McCallion, James) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs David Benton, Dianne Benton. (McCallion, James) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs David Benton, Dianne Benton. (McCallion, James) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24793351 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Dianne Benton, David Benton. (Attorney James McCallion added to party David Benton(pty:pla), Attorney James McCallion added to party Dianne Benton(pty:pla))(McCallion, James) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation answer now due 1/23/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Attorney Derrick Lam added to party National Railroad Passenger Corporation(pty:dft))(Lam, Derrick) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Dianne Benton, David Benton, upon Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Adams, Thomas) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (lh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (McCallion, James) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs David Benton, Dianne Benton. (McCallion, James) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs David Benton, Dianne Benton. (McCallion, James) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24793351 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Dianne Benton, David Benton. (Attorney James McCallion added to party David Benton(pty:pla), Attorney James McCallion added to party Dianne Benton(pty:pla))(McCallion, James) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less