This case was last updated from PACER on 12/31/2019 at 07:27:49 (UTC).

Dominguez v. Banana Republic, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 Dominguez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Banana Republic, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-10171

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yovanny Dominguez

Defendant

Banana Republic, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradly Gurion Marks

Attorney at The Marks Law Firm PC

175 Varick Street 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10014

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Friel Fleming

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP (New York)

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Anne Marie Estevez

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 5300

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to January 27, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/11/2019) (rro) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#10

(#10) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael F. Fleming dated December 9, 2019. Document filed by Banana Republic, LLC.(Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Banana Republic, LLC served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. Service was accepted by NANCY DOUGHERTY, LEGAL CLERK. Document filed by Yovanny Dominguez. (Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

8 #3

Text of Proposed Order

8 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

8 #1

Affidavit of Anne Marie Estevez

#8

(#8) MOTION for Anne Marie Estevez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18245998. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Banana Republic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anne Marie Estevez, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Estevez, Anne) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Friel Fleming on behalf of Banana Republic, LLC. (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#6

(#6) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is currently scheduled for February 25, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. by separate order to be entered today. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/14/2019. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/4/2019) (mro) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/4/2019) (mro) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Banana Republic, LLC. (pc) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Banana Republic, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yovanny Dominguez. (Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Banana Republic, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17878234)Document filed by Yovanny Dominguez.(Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Banana Republic, LLC answer due 1/27/2020. (rro) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to January 27, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/11/2019) (rro) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Anne Marie Estevez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael F. Fleming dated December 9, 2019. Document filed by Banana Republic, LLC.(Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Anne Marie Estevez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18245998. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Banana Republic, LLC served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. Service was accepted by NANCY DOUGHERTY, LEGAL CLERK. Document filed by Yovanny Dominguez. (Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Anne Marie Estevez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18245998. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Banana Republic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anne Marie Estevez, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Estevez, Anne) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Friel Fleming on behalf of Banana Republic, LLC. (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is currently scheduled for February 25, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. by separate order to be entered today. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/14/2019. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/4/2019) (mro) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/4/2019) (mro) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Banana Republic, LLC. (pc) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Banana Republic, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yovanny Dominguez. (Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Banana Republic, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17878234)Document filed by Yovanny Dominguez.(Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less