This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2019 07:29:31

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Henderson against Brasuell in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 4:19-cv-00491
  • Filing Date 07/12/2019
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Prisoner - Civil Right
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge James M. Moody Jr.
  • Courthouse Arkansas Eastern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Mike Robinson
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant J Brent Standridge
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Toney Brasuell
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Contrell Henderson
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Defendant Jonathan Camp
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#6

(#6) JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #5 order filed this date, judgmen...

Free with Subscription
#7

(#7) APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb) (Entere...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) ORDER dismissing without prejudice Henderson's claims; ...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) ORDER denying without prejudice #3 motion to proceed in...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Contre...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS that you m...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Contrell Hen...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • (#7) APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
  • 09/03/2019
  • (#6) JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #5 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/3/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
  • 09/03/2019
  • (#5) ORDER dismissing without prejudice Henderson's claims; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/3/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
  • 07/31/2019
  • (#4) ORDER denying without prejudice #3 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing Henderson to either pay the $400 filing and administrative fee or file a complete IFP application within 30 days from the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send Henderson an IFP application. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/31/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
  • 07/25/2019
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Contrell Henderson. (llg) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#2) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS that you must pay the $400 filing fee or file an IFP motion within 30 days from the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send Mr. Henderson an IFP application. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/15/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Contrell Henderson.(kdr) (Entered: 07/12/2019)