This case was last updated from PACER on 06/16/2020 at 10:44:20 (UTC).

United States of America v. Prevezon Holdings Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2013 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Prevezon Holdings Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Pauley, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:13-CV-06326

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Pauley, III

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Victoria Tarantino Consulting LLC

Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.

Claimant

Martash Holdings

Defendants

Prevezon Holdings Ltd.

Prevezon 1810, L.L.C.

ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********6021 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON SEVEN USA LLC

Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C.

Any and All Assets of Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C.

Any and all assets of Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, titile and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as 127 Seventh Ave. aka 166 West 18th Street

APPROXIMATELY $894,026.21 HELD BY THE UNITED STATES AS A SUBSTITUTE RES FOR ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE S

ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********8242 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON PINE USA, LLC

and all property traceable thereto

A DEBT OF 3,068,946 EUROS OWED BY AFI EUROPE N.V. TO PREVEZON HOLDINGS RESTRAINED BY THE GOVERNMENT OF THE NETHERLANDS ON OR ABOUT JANUARY 22, 2014

APPROXIMATELY $1,046,530.04 HELD BY THE UNITED STATES AS A SUBSTITUTE RES FOR ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE

Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C.

ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********8084 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON SOHO USA LLC

Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C.

Any and All Assets of Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C.

ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE STREET, NEW YORK, NEW YORK 10005, UNIT 1816

Interested Party

HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A.

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Lisa Heather Rubin

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue, 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Randy M. Mastro

200 Park Avenue, 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Cory Spencer Buland

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP (NYC)

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorneys

Jessie Morgan Gabriel

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Faith E. Gay

Attorney at Selendy & Gay PLLC

1290 Avenue Of The Americas, Ste 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10104

Richard Benjamin Harper

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P(NYC)

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

John W. Moscow

Attorney at Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue, Ste 62Nd Floor

New York, NY 10174

Mark Alan Cymrot

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP (DC)

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.,

Washington, DC 20036

Paul M Levine

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP (DC)

Washington Square Suite 1100, 1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.,

Washington, DC 20036

Renita Sharma

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Andrene Letecia Kay Smith

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP (NYC)

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York City, NY 10111

Interested Party Attorney

Alexander John Willscher

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Other Attorneys

Paul Michael Monteleoni

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office, SDNY (St Andw's)

One St. Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

Christine Ingrid Magdo

Attorney at United States Attorney Office, SDNY

One Saint Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

Mason Chandler Simpson

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP (NYC)

Seven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Jaimie Leeser Nawaday

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office, SDNY (St Andw's)

One St. Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

Roger Anson Burlingame

Attorney at Kobre & Kim LLP (NYC)

800 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Andrew Caldwell Adams

Attorney at United States Attorney Office, SDNY

One Saint Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

Cristine Irvin Phillips

Attorney at United States Attorney Office, SDNY

86 Chambers Street, 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10007

Michael Sangyun Kim

Attorney at Kobre & Kim LLP

800 Third Avenue, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

12 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#763

(#763) OPINION & ORDER re: #717 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd: For the foregoing reasons, in this Court's informed discretion, Hermitage's motion for attorneys' fees against Moscow and BakerHostetler is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 717. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/30/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 03/30/2018)

#762

(#762) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the United States, by its attorney, Geoffrey S. Berman, United States Attorney, of counsel, Assistant United States Attorneys Paul M. Monteleoni, Cristine I. Phillips, and Tara M. La Morte, of counsel, and the Defendants and Claimants, by their attorneys, Kevin Reed, Esq., Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP, that: The Settlement Agreement continues in full force and effect except as expressly modified herein, and all terms defined in the Settlement Agreement have the same meaning herein unless specifically redefined herein. Upon entry of this Stipulation and Order, any authorized agent of U.S. Customs and Border Protection having custody of the Restrained Properties shall use portions of the Restrained Properties to make Substitute Payments to the U.S. Treasury to total the amount of the Judgment Payment, in the amounts and from the assets set forth in paragraph 3, below, and under the procedures set forth in paragraph 4, below. The Substitute Payments shall be drawn from the following assets in the following amounts: 1. From the 250 East 49th Street, Unit Comm3 Sale Proceeds, a Substitute Payment in the amount of $4,429,019.44 shall be made under the procedures set forth in paragraph 4, below. 2. From the 20 Pine Street Unit 2009 Sale Proceeds, a Substitute Payment in the amount of $1,379,518.94 shall be made under the procedures set forth in paragraph 4, below. 3. From the 20 Pine Street, Unit 1711 Sale Proceeds, a Substitute Payment in the amount of $230,276.54 shall be made under the procedures set forth in paragraph 4, below. The Amended Protective Order is hereby vacated. The Action is dismissed against all Defendants with prejudice. Notwithstanding paragraph 10, above, this Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the Settlement Agreement, the Enforcement Order and the Judgment, and this Stipulation and Order. Each Party to this Stipulation and Order will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The signatories to this Stipulation and Order each represent that they are duly authorized to sign this Stipulation and Order, and as further set forth in this stipulation and order. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/8/2018) (jwh) Modified on 3/8/2018 (jwh). (Entered: 03/08/2018)

761 #1

Stipulation Executed by Parties

#761

(#761) LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated March 7, 2018 re: Stipulation Modifying Settlement Agreement. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Executed by Parties)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 03/07/2018)

760 #1

Right to Appeal

#760

(#760) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #759 Opinion & Order. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion & Order dated February 2, 2018, the Government's motion to enforce the Settlement is granted, and Prevezon's motion for discovery is denied. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the Government, in the amount of $5,896.333.65, plus pre-judgment interest at an interest rate of 9% per annum, running from October 31, 2017 to the date judgment is entered, which as of February 6, 2018 is $142,481.27. Accordingly, judgment is hereby entered in the favor of the Government for a total amount of $6,038.814.92. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 2/6/2018) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal)(tro) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

#759

(#759) OPINION & ORDER re: #743 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by United States of America: For the foregoing reasons, the Government's motion to enforce the Settlement Agreement is granted. Separately, Prevezon's application for discovery is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Government, and calculate pre-judgment interest at a rate of 9% per annum. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 743. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/2/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#743

(#759) OPINION & ORDER re: #743 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by United States of America: For the foregoing reasons, the Government's motion to enforce the Settlement Agreement is granted. Separately, Prevezon's application for discovery is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Government, and calculate pre-judgment interest at a rate of 9% per annum. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 743. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/2/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#717

(#763) OPINION & ORDER re: #717 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd: For the foregoing reasons, in this Court's informed discretion, Hermitage's motion for attorneys' fees against Moscow and BakerHostetler is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 717. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/30/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 03/30/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Alan Cymrot on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark) (Entered: 10/11/2013)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrene Letecia Kay Smith on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Smith, Andrene) (Entered: 10/11/2013)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John W. Moscow on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John) (Entered: 10/11/2013)

#2

(#2) POST-COMPLAINT PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. 983 (j)(1): NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREE, PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C 983 (j)(A), THAT: The following persons: As set forth herein, and attorneys and other persons and entities acting for or in concert with the above-named businesses and/or entities having actual knowledge of this Order; shall not take any action prohibited by this Order; And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/11/2013) (ama) (Entered: 09/11/2013)

1 #4

d

1 #3

c

1 #2

b

1 #1

a

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Any and All Assets of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Holdings, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C. incl;uding but not limited to any and all funds on deposit in bank of america acct # 483016158084, Any and All assets of Kolevins, Ltd., Any and all assets of Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine STreet Condominium, 20 Pine Stree, Any and all assets of Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine Street, NY NY 10005, Unit 1816 (, Any and all assets of Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, titile and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as 127 Seventh Ave. aka 166 West 18th Street, Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., and all property traceable thereto.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 a, #2 b, #3 c, #4 d)(laq) (Entered: 09/11/2013)

1,783 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#763) OPINION & ORDER re: #717 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd: For the foregoing reasons, in this Court's informed discretion, Hermitage's motion for attorneys' fees against Moscow and BakerHostetler is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 717. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/30/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 03/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketTerminate Transcript Deadlines (jwh) (Entered: 03/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#762) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the United States, by its attorney, Geoffrey S. Berman, United States Attorney, of counsel, Assistant United States Attorneys Paul M. Monteleoni, Cristine I. Phillips, and Tara M. La Morte, of counsel, and the Defendants and Claimants, by their attorneys, Kevin Reed, Esq., Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP, that: The Settlement Agreement continues in full force and effect except as expressly modified herein, and all terms defined in the Settlement Agreement have the same meaning herein unless specifically redefined herein. Upon entry of this Stipulation and Order, any authorized agent of U.S. Customs and Border Protection having custody of the Restrained Properties shall use portions of the Restrained Properties to make Substitute Payments to the U.S. Treasury to total the amount of the Judgment Payment, in the amounts and from the assets set forth in paragraph 3, below, and under the procedures set forth in paragraph 4, below. The Substitute Payments shall be drawn from the following assets in the following amounts: 1. From the 250 East 49th Street, Unit Comm3 Sale Proceeds, a Substitute Payment in the amount of $4,429,019.44 shall be made under the procedures set forth in paragraph 4, below. 2. From the 20 Pine Street Unit 2009 Sale Proceeds, a Substitute Payment in the amount of $1,379,518.94 shall be made under the procedures set forth in paragraph 4, below. 3. From the 20 Pine Street, Unit 1711 Sale Proceeds, a Substitute Payment in the amount of $230,276.54 shall be made under the procedures set forth in paragraph 4, below. The Amended Protective Order is hereby vacated. The Action is dismissed against all Defendants with prejudice. Notwithstanding paragraph 10, above, this Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the Settlement Agreement, the Enforcement Order and the Judgment, and this Stipulation and Order. Each Party to this Stipulation and Order will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The signatories to this Stipulation and Order each represent that they are duly authorized to sign this Stipulation and Order, and as further set forth in this stipulation and order. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/8/2018) (jwh) Modified on 3/8/2018 (jwh). (Entered: 03/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#761) LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated March 7, 2018 re: Stipulation Modifying Settlement Agreement. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Executed by Parties)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 03/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#760) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #759 Opinion & Order. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion & Order dated February 2, 2018, the Government's motion to enforce the Settlement is granted, and Prevezon's motion for discovery is denied. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the Government, in the amount of $5,896.333.65, plus pre-judgment interest at an interest rate of 9% per annum, running from October 31, 2017 to the date judgment is entered, which as of February 6, 2018 is $142,481.27. Accordingly, judgment is hereby entered in the favor of the Government for a total amount of $6,038.814.92. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 2/6/2018) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal)(tro) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #759 Memorandum & Opinion to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (jwh) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#759) OPINION & ORDER re: #743 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by United States of America: For the foregoing reasons, the Government's motion to enforce the Settlement Agreement is granted. Separately, Prevezon's application for discovery is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Government, and calculate pre-judgment interest at a rate of 9% per annum. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 743. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/2/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#758) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 12/14/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#757) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 12/14/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#756) LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Faith Gay dated December 22, 2017 re: Newly-Produced Dutch Documents. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Email)(Gay, Faith) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
812 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SECOND JOINT STIPULATION ADJOURNING THE TIME FOR FILING THE NOTICE OF CLAIM AND INTEREST: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by the undersigned counsel, on behalf of all the parties as follows: Under the Joint Stipulation Adjourning the Time for Filing the Notice of Claim and Interest ordered by this Court on October 17, 2013, the return date for the first of the Defendants' and Defendants-in-rem's notice of claim and interest in the defendant real properties and bank: accounts enumerated in the Verified Complaint of the United States of America (the "Defendant Properties") was adjourned until October 29,2013. Counsel for the undersigned parties have been talking and will be talking together to avoid unnecessary issues. Both sides stipulate and agree that the due date for the Defendants' notice of claim and interest in the Defendant Properties and that of all Claimants with actual notice is hereby adjourned until November 12, 2013. The Defendants and Defendants-in-rem do not waive any objections to service of process and personal jurisdiction by the submission of this stipulation and reserve all jurisdictional and other defenses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/28/2013) (ama) (Entered: 10/28/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT STIPULATION ADJOURNING THE TIME FOR FILING THE NOTICE OF CLAIM AND INTEREST: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by the undersigned counsel, on behalf of all the parties as follows: 1. On September 10, 2013, the United States commenced a civil action in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York seeking the forfeiture of all of the assets worldwide of the above-referenced Defendants-in-rem, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 981(a)(1)(A), 985 and 1956(b)(l) and an in personam judgment against the Defendants. 2. Under Rule G of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions, the first of the Defendants' and Defendants-in-rem's notice of claim and interest in the defendant real properties and bank accounts enumerated in the Verified Complaint of the United States of America (the "Defendant Properties") is returnable on October 15, 2013. 3. The due date for the Defendants' notice of claim and interest in the Defendant Properties and that of all Claimants with actual notice is hereby adjourned until October 29, 2013. 4. The Defendants and Defendants-in-rem do not waive any objections to service of process and personal jurisdiction by the submission of this stipulation and reserve all jurisdictional and other defenses. 5. A facsimile of this Stipulation shall be deemed an original for all purposes. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/17/2013) (djc) Modified on 10/18/2013 (djc). (Entered: 10/18/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Alan Cymrot on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark) (Entered: 10/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrene Letecia Kay Smith on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Smith, Andrene) (Entered: 10/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John W. Moscow on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John) (Entered: 10/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) POST-COMPLAINT PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. 983 (j)(1): NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREE, PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C 983 (j)(A), THAT: The following persons: As set forth herein, and attorneys and other persons and entities acting for or in concert with the above-named businesses and/or entities having actual knowledge of this Order; shall not take any action prohibited by this Order; And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/11/2013) (ama) (Entered: 09/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (laq) (Entered: 09/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (laq) (Entered: 09/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Any and All Assets of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Holdings, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C. incl;uding but not limited to any and all funds on deposit in bank of america acct # 483016158084, Any and All assets of Kolevins, Ltd., Any and all assets of Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine STreet Condominium, 20 Pine Stree, Any and all assets of Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine Street, NY NY 10005, Unit 1816 (, Any and all assets of Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, titile and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as 127 Seventh Ave. aka 166 West 18th Street, Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., and all property traceable thereto.. (laq) (Entered: 09/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Any and All Assets of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Holdings, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C. incl;uding but not limited to any and all funds on deposit in bank of america acct # 483016158084, Any and All assets of Kolevins, Ltd., Any and all assets of Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine STreet Condominium, 20 Pine Stree, Any and all assets of Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine Street, NY NY 10005, Unit 1816 (, Any and all assets of Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, titile and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as 127 Seventh Ave. aka 166 West 18th Street, Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., and all property traceable thereto.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 a, #2 b, #3 c, #4 d)(laq) (Entered: 09/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less