This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2019 07:48:03

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 a Contract - Marine case was filed by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC against Epic Applied Technologies, LLC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Maryland District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 1:19-cv-02054
  • Filing Date 07/12/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Contract - Marine
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Richard D. Bennett
  • Courthouse Maryland District

Party Details

  • Garnishee Bank of America, N.A.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff McAllister Towing of New York, LLC
  • Represented By
    • J Stephen Simms
  • Defendant Epic Applied Technologies, LLC
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

13 #1

Exhibit A - Federal Express Delivery Confirmation

Fees Apply
#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by McAllister Towing of New ...

Fees Apply
#12

(#12) Writ of Garnishment Executed.(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/2...

Fees Apply
#11

(#11) WRIT of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment issued (jn...

Fees Apply
#10

(#10) APPLICATION for Writ of MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNIS...

Fees Apply
#9

(#9) Writ of Garnishment Executed.(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/22...

Fees Apply
#8

(#8) WRIT of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment issued (jnl...

Fees Apply
#7

(#7) ORDER for Appointment of Service of Process of Maritime...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) ORDER for Issue of Process of Maritime Attachment and G...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Epic Applied Technologies, LLC.(ds...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) MOTION for Appointment for Service of Writ of Maritime ...

Fees Apply
10 #1

PMAG - BofA

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC. Epic Applied Technologies, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Delivery Confirmation)(Simms, J) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
  • 07/24/2019
  • (#12) Writ of Garnishment Executed.(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
  • 07/24/2019
  • (#11) WRIT of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment issued (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#10) APPLICATION for Writ of MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT Request for Additional Issue of Writ per Court's Order [ECF 6] (Attachments: #1 PMAG - BofA)(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#9) Writ of Garnishment Executed.(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#8) WRIT of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment issued (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#7) ORDER for Appointment of Service of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/15/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#6) ORDER for Issue of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/15/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Epic Applied Technologies, LLC.(ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#4) MOTION for Appointment for Service of Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#3) MOTION for Order Authorizing Issuance of Writs of Maritime Attachment by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Process of Maritime Attachment & Garnishment - BofA)(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC (Simms, J) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Epic Applied Technologies, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8121564.), filed by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/12/2019)