This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2019 at 08:07:08 (UTC).

TOOLEY v. DDC HOTELS, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 TOOLEY filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against DDC HOTELS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03963

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENNIS TOOLEY

Defendant

DDC HOTELS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman

Attorney at KU & MUSSMAN PA

18501 Pines Boulevard, Suite 209-A

Pembroke Pines, FL 33029

Eric C. Bohnet

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

6617 Southern Cross Drive

Indianapolis, IN 46237

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. DDC HOTELS, INC. served on 9/23/2019. (Mussman, Louis Ivan) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#6

(#6) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to DDC HOTELS, INC. (REO) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C. Bohnet on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Bohnet, Eric) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Mussman, Louis Ivan) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DDC HOTELS, INC., filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5637507) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Mussman, Louis Ivan) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN of Service, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. DDC HOTELS, INC. served on 9/23/2019. (Mussman, Louis Ivan) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to DDC HOTELS, INC. (REO) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C. Bohnet on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Bohnet, Eric) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Mussman, Louis Ivan) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against DDC HOTELS, INC., filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5637507) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Mussman, Louis Ivan) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less