This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 13:57:57 (UTC).

Naiman v. Tesla Energy Solar et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Naiman filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Tesla Energy Solar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sallie Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00468

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sallie Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sidney Naiman

Defendants

Does 1 through 10, inclusive, and each of them

Tesla Energy Solar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd Michael Friedman

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.

21550 Oxnard Street, Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Tesla Energy Solar. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2020) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#9

(#9) Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 3/11/2020) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed bySidney Naiman. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 3/11/2020) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sidney Naiman.. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 2/20/2020) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#6

(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/5/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Tesla Energy Solar. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14094698.). Filed bySidney Naiman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Tesla Energy Solar. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2020) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 3/11/2020) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed bySidney Naiman. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 3/11/2020) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sidney Naiman.. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 2/20/2020) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/5/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Tesla Energy Solar. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/5/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14094698.). Filed bySidney Naiman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less