This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2016 13:49:52

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by SANTIAGO GUERRERO, against SOURCE ONE INVESTMENT, INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number YC057961
  • Filing Date 08/22/2008
  • Case Status Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type Contract - Other Contract
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge ANDREW C. KAUFFMAN
  • Courthouse Torrance Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Defendant DOES 1-10
  • Represented By
    • LAW OFFICE OF ANDREW D. WEISS
  • Plaintiff GUERRERO GRISELDA
  • Represented By
    • SPIERER WOODWARD CORBALIS & GOLDBERG
    • MARGULIES HAROLD P.
  • Defendant COLDWELL BANKER SOURCE ONE REALTY
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant DEL ROSARIO EDUARDO RAZO
  • Represented By
    • LAW OFFICE OF ANDREW D. WEISS
  • Defendant SOURCE ONE INVESTMENT INC.
  • Represented By
    • LAW OFFICE OF ANDREW D. WEISS
  • Plaintiff GUERRERO SANTIAGO
  • Represented By
    • SPIERER WOODWARD CORBALIS & GOLDBERG
    • MARGULIES HAROLD P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2010
  • Application - Miscellaneous (AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAM. OF DEFT. EDUARDO RAZO ROSARIO ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 06/15/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment (ISSUED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 06/15/2010
  • Writ-Other (OF EXECUTION ISSUED FOR THE COUNTY: LOS ANGELES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 06/14/2010
  • Declaration (OF ACCRUED INTEREST: $1,860.96 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 06/02/2010
  • Request for Correction (MEMO OF COSTS/ABSTRACT/WRIT REJECTED: DOCS NOT SIGNED ) Filed by Clerk
  • 05/20/2010
  • Request for Correction (REJECTION OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; WRIT OF EXECUTION: JUDGMENT AMOUNT IS INCORRECT ) Filed by Clerk
  • 05/20/2010
  • Substitution of Attorney (FORMER: SPIERER, WOODWARD. CORBELI NEW: HAROLD P. MARGUILIES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 08/25/2009
  • Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 08/05/2009
  • Declaration (OF ATTY'S FEES AND COSTS INCURRED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 08/05/2009
  • Memorandum of Costs Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 07/27/2009
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 07/16/2009
  • Reply to Opposition ( TO PLNTFFS' MSJ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 07/10/2009
  • Opposition (BY SOURCE ONE INVESTMENT, INC. TO THE PLTFS. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
  • 06/26/2009
  • Proof of Service (X-SUMMONS AND X-COMPLNT SERV. ON EDUARDO RAZO DEL ROSARIO BY PERSONAL SERV. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
  • 05/04/2009
  • Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPP. OF MSJ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 05/04/2009
  • Motion for Summary Judgment (PLNTFFS. SANTIAGO AND GRISELDA GUERRERO MSJ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 03/17/2009
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant
  • 02/26/2009
  • Notice (OF CONT. OF CMC AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 02/19/2009
  • Declaration (OF PETER RUSTIN IN SUPP. OF PLNTFF MOT. TO DEEM THE TRUTH OF ALL MATTERS ADMITTED TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
  • 02/13/2009
  • Motion to Compel (PLNTTFS SANTIAGO AND GRISELDA MOT TO COMPEL DEFT'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGS. AND FOR AN ORDER FOR SANCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff