This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2019 07:52:51

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 a Civil Right - Other Civil Right case was filed by Pai against County of Hawaii in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 1:19-cv-00440
  • Filing Date 08/13/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Civil Right - Other Civil Right
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge ROM TRADER
  • Courthouse Hawaii District

Party Details

  • Defendant Doe Corporations 2-10
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Kaheana Kathleen Kawale Pai
  • Represented By
    • Peter C. Hsieh
    • Michael Jay Green
  • Defendant County of Hawaii
  • Represented By
    • Laureen L. Martin
    • Roland J. Talon
  • Defendant John Doe 2
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Jane Does 1-10
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Keawe Bradley Dean Mahina Pai
  • Represented By
    • Peter C. Hsieh
    • Michael Jay Green
  • Defendant Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant John Does 3-10
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant John Doe 1
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by County of Hawaii.(Talon, Rol...

Fees Apply
#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaheana Kathleen Kawale Pa...

Fees Apply
5 #2

AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons

Fees Apply
5 #1

AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Sum...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Rega...

Fees Apply
4 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for ...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to County of Hawaii. (emt, ) (Entered...

Fees Apply
10 #1

Certificate of Service

Fees Apply
#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Laureen L. Martin on behalf of...

Fees Apply
1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) COMPLAINT , DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, (Proposed) SUMMONS a...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Laureen L. Martin on behalf of County of Hawaii on behalf of County of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Laureen) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
  • 09/06/2019
  • (#9) EO: Roland Talon is allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/19 @ 9:00 a.m. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
  • 09/06/2019
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by County of Hawaii.(Talon, Roland) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaheana Kathleen Kawale Pai. County of Hawaii served on 8/20/2019 . (Hsieh, Peter) Modified on 8/26/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 08/23/2019)
  • 08/21/2019
  • (#6) EO: The Court RESCHEDULES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/19 @ 9:00 AM to 10/29/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 10/22/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, ) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
  • 08/13/2019
  • (#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
  • 08/13/2019
  • (#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
  • 08/13/2019
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to County of Hawaii. (emt, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
  • 08/13/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00440 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
  • 08/13/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT , DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, (Proposed) SUMMONS against County of Hawaii ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2247155.), filed by Keawe D. M. Pai Keawe Bradley Dean Mahina Pai and Kaheana Kathleen Kawale Pai . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hsieh, Peter) Docket text modified on 8/13/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 08/13/2019)