This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2019 07:46:41

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability case was filed by SS Alcala against Commissioner of Social Security in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 2:19-cv-01579
  • Filing Date 08/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Government Benefit - Social Security Disability
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Dennis M. Cota
  • Courthouse California Eastern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Commissioner of Social Security
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Jessica Alcala
  • Represented By
    • Harvey Peter Sackett

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/24...

Free with Subscription
#4

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/16...

Free with Subscription
#2

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
5 #2

SS Consent Form

Fees Apply
5 #1

Order re Consent

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURIT...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • (#6) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/24/2019 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, within 30 days, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to submit service documents to the United States Marshall. The filing of a notice that plaintiff has submitted service documents to the United States Marshall shall constitute a sufficient response to this order. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
  • 08/16/2019
  • (#5) SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 SS Consent Form) (York, M) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
  • 08/16/2019
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Harvey Peter Sackett* *Sackett & Associates, A Professional Law Corporation* *1055 Lincoln Ave.* *San Jose, CA 95125*. (York, M) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
  • 08/16/2019
  • (#3) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/16/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The clerk is DIRECTED to issue process. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the necessary documents and file a statement with the court. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs within 60 days from the date of this order. (Copy to: USM.) (York, M) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
  • 08/14/2019
  • APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
  • 08/14/2019
  • (#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jessica Alcala. (Sackett, Harvey) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
  • 08/14/2019
  • (#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Jessica Alcala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sackett, Harvey) (Entered: 08/09/2019)