This case was last updated from PACER on 08/19/2019 at 07:51:05 (UTC).

Fowler-Posman v. NYSARC, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 Fowler-Posman filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against NYSARC, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael A. Telesca. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06447

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Telesca

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Fowler-Posman

Defendant

NYSARC, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James D. Hartt

70 Linden Oaks, Third Floor

Rochester, NY 14625

Defendant Attorney

Daniel William Morris

Attorney at Clifton Budd & DeMaria, LLP

The Empire State Building, 350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6110

New York, NY 10118

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NYSARC, Inc..(Morris, Daniel) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#8

(#8) Letter filed by NYSARC, Inc. as to NYSARC, Inc. . (Morris, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Fowler-Posman. NYSARC Inc served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Hartt, James) Modified on 8/12/2019 (LB). (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel William Morris on behalf of NYSARC, Inc. (Morris, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to NYSARC, Inc.. (BK) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

4 #3

Proposed Amended Summons

4 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover

4 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - EEOC Right to Sue

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT Linda Fowler-Posman against NYSARC, Inc., filed by Linda Fowler-Posman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - EEOC Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover, #3 Proposed Amended Summons)(Hartt, James) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Fowler-Posman. NYSARC, Inc. served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Hartt, James) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to NYSARC, Inc.. (BK) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - US EEOC Right to Sue

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Linda Fowler-Posman against NYSARC, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3493719, filed by Linda Fowler-Posman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - US EEOC Right to Sue, #3 Proposed Summons)(Hartt, James) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NYSARC, Inc..(Morris, Daniel) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-Filing Notification: RE #8 Letter filed by NYSARC, Inc. as to NYSARC, Inc. . (Morris, Daniel). This document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. ACTION REQUIRED: Re-file document using the motion event. (BK) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter filed by NYSARC, Inc. as to NYSARC, Inc. . (Morris, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Fowler-Posman. NYSARC Inc served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Hartt, James) Modified on 8/12/2019 (LB). (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel William Morris on behalf of NYSARC, Inc. (Morris, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to NYSARC, Inc.. (BK) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT Linda Fowler-Posman against NYSARC, Inc., filed by Linda Fowler-Posman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - EEOC Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover, #3 Proposed Amended Summons)(Hartt, James) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Fowler-Posman. NYSARC, Inc. served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Hartt, James) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to NYSARC, Inc.. (BK) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (BK) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Case Assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (BK) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Linda Fowler-Posman against NYSARC, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3493719, filed by Linda Fowler-Posman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - US EEOC Right to Sue, #3 Proposed Summons)(Hartt, James) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less