This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 06:15:35 (UTC).

WEINGARTEN JORDAN, WEINGARTEN NORMAN J Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 WEINGARTEN JORDAN, WEINGARTEN NORMAN J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0085

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

WEINGARTEN JORDAN

Not Classified By Court

WEINGARTEN NORMAN J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

COWAN CLAIBORNE LAMAR

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB WILL

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

01/14/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

01/14/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

02/19/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB WILL

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/14/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

01/14/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

01/14/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/14/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

05/28/2019 - PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

PLD:PB SECTION 308 A AFFIDAVIT

05/24/2019 - PLD:PB SECTION 308 A AFFIDAVIT

NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

03/13/2019 - NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

PLD:PB FILE COPY OF LETTER

03/05/2019 - PLD:PB FILE COPY OF LETTER

PLD:PB OATH

02/28/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

02/28/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

02/28/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB SECTION 308 A AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB FILE COPY OF LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB JUDGE SIG FOR LETTERS; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ADMIN OF OATH; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: PLD:PB OATH

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less