This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 05/21/2023 at 16:01:46 (UTC).

THE STATE OF TEXAS V. REALTY INCOME TEXAS PROPERTIES, L.P., A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP N/K/A, VIA CONVERSION INTO REALTY INCOME TEXAS PROPERTIES 1, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2023 THE STATE OF TEXAS filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against REALTY INCOME TEXAS PROPERTIES, L P , A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP N/K/A, VIA CONVERSION INTO REALTY INCOME TEXAS PROPERTIES 1, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Herman, Guy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0578

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Herman, Guy

 

Party Details

Defendants

REALTY INCOME TEXAS PROPERTIES, L.P.

HAG RE CDT, LLC

ALLY BANK

HENDRICK AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, LLC

NTW LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TBC CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

PUBLIC - OPN:PB CONDEMNATION PETITION

PB County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

PB County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - CN:PB ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

PB County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - PLD:PB FILE COPY OF LETTER

PB County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - CN:PB ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

PB County Clerk Public Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCN:PB ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCN:PB OATH OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:PB FILE COPY OF LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCN:PB ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketMSC:PB PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPN:PB CONDEMNATION PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less