This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 09/09/2021 at 18:02:25 (UTC).

THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY VS DOORS DEVELOPMENT LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOORS DEVELOPMENT LLC. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5315

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY

Defendants

DOORS DEVELOPMENT LLC

VANKA PRASHANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAIR RANDALL F.

 

Court Documents

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

05/28/2021 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

05/21/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

05/21/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

PLD:CV AMENDED PETITION

05/12/2021 - PLD:CV AMENDED PETITION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

11/24/2020 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

11/24/2020 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

11/23/2020 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV AMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Sherwin-Williams Company is a litigant