This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 10/16/2020 at 18:01:43 (UTC).

TATSCH RONALD WAYNE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 TATSCH RONALD WAYNE was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4585

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

TATSCH RONALD WAYNE

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV OCC LICENSE SIGNED

09/28/2020 - DSP:CV OCC LICENSE SIGNED

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

09/24/2020 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO DPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSP:CV OCC LICENSE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV COPY FEE CLERK MAKES; Amount: $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CERTIFICATION FEE; Amount: $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CV COPY FEE CLERK MAKES; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV CERTIFICATION FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less