This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/20/2020 at 07:57:14 (UTC).

TATE VICKIE G., WILLIAMS LESLIE TATE Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 TATE VICKIE G , WILLIAMS LESLIE TATE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0469

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

TATE VICKIE G.

Applicant

WILLIAMS LESLIE TATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

BLOOMQUIST AMY PETERSON

 

Court Documents

ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

06/24/2019 - ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

06/10/2019 - MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

06/10/2019 - PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

PLD:PB SECTION 308 A AFFIDAVIT

06/10/2019 - PLD:PB SECTION 308 A AFFIDAVIT

PLD:PB PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT

04/12/2019 - PLD:PB PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

03/28/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:PB OATH

03/28/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

03/28/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

03/14/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

03/08/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

03/05/2019 - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

03/05/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB WILL

03/05/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

03/04/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

03/04/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:PB COPY REQ SENT TO CUSTOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB SECTION 308 A AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ASM:CONSTABLE SERVICE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less