This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 06:23:24 (UTC).

SULLIVAN ALETHA TERESA, SULLIVAN DANIEL WALTER Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 SULLIVAN ALETHA TERESA, SULLIVAN DANIEL WALTER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0100

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

SULLIVAN ALETHA TERESA

Not Classified By Court

SULLIVAN DANIEL WALTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

WILLI TRACY J.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

JACKSON JUSTIN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB ORIGINAL ANSWER OF AAL

01/31/2019 - PLD:PB ORIGINAL ANSWER OF AAL

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

01/22/2018 - PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

01/17/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

01/17/2019 - ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/16/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/16/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

OPN:PB APPL APPT IND ADMN HEIR

01/16/2019 - OPN:PB APPL APPT IND ADMN HEIR

PLD:PB STATEMENT OF FACTS

08/22/2019 - PLD:PB STATEMENT OF FACTS

PLD:PB STATEMENT OF FACTS

08/22/2019 - PLD:PB STATEMENT OF FACTS

PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

06/20/2019 - PLD:PB REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM

PLD:PB ORIGINAL ANSWER OF AAL

01/31/2019 - PLD:PB ORIGINAL ANSWER OF AAL

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

01/17/2019 - ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/16/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/16/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

02/12/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSB:ATTORNEY AD LITEM FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB RECORD AUTH CT APPT FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB JUDGE SIG FOR LETTERS; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Amount: $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ADMIN OF OATH; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 10; Event Description: PLD:PB OATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: PLD:PB STATEMENT OF FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:PB CIT PUBLICATION AFTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NTC IND ADM HEIR; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: OPN:PB APPL APPT IND ADMN HEIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ATTY AD LITEM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB ADMINISTRATION FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $317.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less