This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 10/11/2021 at 17:35:45 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS VS SALAZAR MIKE

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against SALAZAR MIKE. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3765

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendant

SALAZAR MIKE

 

Court Documents

RET:CV CITATION RET UNSERVED

09/09/2021 - RET:CV CITATION RET UNSERVED

PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

08/26/2021 - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

08/17/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

MSC:BF COPY OF JDG NISI

07/12/2021 - MSC:BF COPY OF JDG NISI

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV CITATION RET UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV BF CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ORD:CV PERSNL BOND CASE FILED; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $11000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV BOND FORFEITURE FILING; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:BF COPY OF JDG NISI

    Read MoreRead Less