This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 08/14/2020 at 18:45:34 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS VS RODRIGUEZ ERICK FERNANDO

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ ERICK FERNANDO. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9213

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ ERICK FERNANDO

 

Court Documents

DSP:BF DISMISSED FEES DUE

01/23/2020 - DSP:BF DISMISSED FEES DUE

RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

11/18/2019 - RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

11/12/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

MSC:BF COPY OF JDG NISI

11/12/2019 - MSC:BF COPY OF JDG NISI

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CT ORDER FORFEITED AMT; Amount: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV BOND FORFEITURE FILING; Amount: $305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DSP:BF DISMISSED FEES DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CT ORDER FORFEITED AMT; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV BF CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ORD:CV PERSNL BOND CASE FILED; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $3000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV BOND FORFEITURE FILING; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:BF COPY OF JDG NISI

    Read MoreRead Less