This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 12/04/2020 at 20:04:59 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS VS LANGLEY CHRISTOPHER BLAINE Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against LANGLEY CHRISTOPHER BLAINE. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9720

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

LANGLEY CHRISTOPHER BLAINE

UNITED STATES FIRE INS. CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BUSS DIANA ELIZABETH

MCLEHANY ALANA RUTH

 

Court Documents

MSC:CV OTHER

07/30/2020 - MSC:CV OTHER

DSP:BF DISMISSED FEES DUE

07/28/2020 - DSP:BF DISMISSED FEES DUE

MOT:CV DISMISS

07/28/2020 - MOT:CV DISMISS

RET:CV BF CITATION RETURNED

12/12/2019 - RET:CV BF CITATION RETURNED

RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

12/12/2019 - RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

PLD:CV ANSWER

12/09/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

12/04/2019 - RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

12/02/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

MSC:BF COPY OF JDG NISI

12/02/2019 - MSC:BF COPY OF JDG NISI

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CT ORDER FORFEITED AMT; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CONSTABLE 5 SERVICE FEE; Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV BOND FORFEITURE FILING; Amount: $305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: MSC:CV OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV CT ORDER FORFEITED AMT; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: DSP:BF DISMISSED FEES DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: TWONG:CV ORD OF DISMISSAL SGND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MOT:CV DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: RET:CV BF CITATION RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV ANSWER; Party Type: DF2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ASM:CV CONSTABLE 5 SERVICE FEE; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:CV BF CITATION; Party Type: DF2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:CV BF CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: MSC:BF COPY OF JDG NISI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ORD:CV SURETY CASE FILED; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV BOND FORFEITURE FILING; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Fire Insurance Company/80565 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCLEHANY ALANA RUTH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUSS DIANA ELIZABETH