This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/20/2020 at 10:21:36 (UTC).

STATE OF TEXAS VS ACCREDITED SURETY & CASULTY CO. Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 STATE OF TEXAS filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against ACCREDITED SURETY CASULTY CO. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0667

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

ELIZONDO MERRY CHRISTINA

ACCREDITED SURETY & CASULTY CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GOOD KENNETH W.

 

Court Documents

DSP:BF DISMISSED FEES DUE

07/03/2019 - DSP:BF DISMISSED FEES DUE

PLD:CV ANSWER

01/31/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

01/28/2019 - RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

01/22/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

MSC:BF COPY OF JDG NISI

01/22/2019 - MSC:BF COPY OF JDG NISI

RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

02/01/2019 - RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

PLD:CV ANSWER

01/31/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

01/28/2019 - RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

01/22/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

MSC:BF COPY OF JDG NISI

01/22/2019 - MSC:BF COPY OF JDG NISI

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CT ORDER FORFEITED AMT; Amount: $290.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CONSTABLE 5 SERVICE FEE; Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV BOND FORFEITURE FILING; Amount: $305.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: DSP:BF DISMISSED FEES DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV CT ORDER FORFEITED AMT; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $290.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: TWONG:DISMISS ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV ANSWER; Party Type: DF2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV BF CITATION W/AFFD SRVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: MSC:BF ATTY APPOINTED-INDIGENT; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: MSC:BF COPY OF JDG NISI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ORD:CV PERSNL BOND CASE FILED; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $16500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV CONSTABLE 5 SERVICE FEE; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV BOND FORFEITURE FILING; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $305.00

    Read MoreRead Less