This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/07/2020 at 14:12:14 (UTC).

SLG MILLENNIUM GROUP, LLC VS HAN CHARLENE

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 SLG MILLENNIUM GROUP, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against HAN CHARLENE. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2007

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SLG MILLENNIUM GROUP, LLC

Defendant

HAN CHARLENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NESBITT THOMAS ANDREW

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV NOTICE OF NON SUIT

09/12/2019 - DSP:CV NOTICE OF NON SUIT

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

08/27/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

03/08/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

03/05/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSP:CV NOTICE OF NON SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less