This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 07/04/2020 at 05:43:17 (UTC).

SHARPE LORIE BERNICE VS TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 SHARPE LORIE BERNICE filed an Other lawsuit against TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0308

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHARPE LORIE BERNICE

Defendants

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

PHUNG TROY TRONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BLECH ROBERT J.

VALERIANE MATTHEW TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT

10/02/2019 - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT

MSC:CV RESPONSE

05/15/2019 - MSC:CV RESPONSE

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/29/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

01/28/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

01/23/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/18/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/11/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF INABILITY

01/10/2019 - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF INABILITY

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/10/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

01/23/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/11/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/10/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

PLD:CV SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS

08/28/2019 - PLD:CV SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

08/13/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

05/17/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

MOT:CV DISMISS

04/16/2019 - MOT:CV DISMISS

PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT

03/28/2019 - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT

PLD:CV ANSWER

03/01/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: P/M/SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Duration: 30 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: MNT/NO EVIDENCE SJ; Duration: 30 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: D/M/SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Duration: 30 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: MNT/NO EVIDENCE SJ; Duration: 30 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: P/M/SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Duration: 30 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: D/M/SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Duration: 30 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: D/M/SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Duration: 30 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: P/M/SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Duration: 30 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:CV OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: PLD:CV STATEMENT OF INABILITY; Party Type: PL1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: WAV:CV CONSTABLE 5 SERVICE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $-75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ASM:CV CONSTABLE 5 SERVICE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: WAV:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $-4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: WAV:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $-272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less