This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 07:47:52 (UTC).

RUTKOWSKI CONSTANCE, RUTKOWSKI MICHAEL J. Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 RUTKOWSKI CONSTANCE, RUTKOWSKI MICHAEL J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0437

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

RUTKOWSKI CONSTANCE

Not Classified By Court

RUTKOWSKI MICHAEL J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

LUMLEY ANN LYN

 

Court Documents

ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

06/18/2019 - ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

PLD:PB PROOF SERV NOT CREDITOR

06/11/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF SERV NOT CREDITOR

MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

06/07/2019 - MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

06/07/2019 - PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

04/09/2019 - NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

PLD:PB SECTION 308 A AFFIDAVIT

03/28/2019 - PLD:PB SECTION 308 A AFFIDAVIT

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

03/26/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:PB OATH

03/26/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

03/26/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/28/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

02/28/2019 - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:PB WILL

02/28/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

02/27/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

02/27/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

02/27/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:PB COPY REQ SENT TO CUSTOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB PROOF SERV NOT CREDITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less