This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 10/25/2020 at 08:07:04 (UTC).

ROBERTS CATHERINE JOHNSTON

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 ROBERTS CATHERINE JOHNSTON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1913

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

ROBERTS CATHERINE JOHNSTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

WILSON TODD ANDREW

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

10/12/2020 - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

10/07/2020 - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

ORD:PB APPTMENT OF SUCCESSOR

10/07/2020 - ORD:PB APPTMENT OF SUCCESSOR

MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

09/24/2020 - MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

OPN:PB APPLICATION

09/24/2020 - OPN:PB APPLICATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:PB COPY REQ SENT TO CUSTOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:PB COPY REQ SENT TO CUSTOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB CERTIFICATION FEE; Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB CERTIFICATION FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB CERTIFICATION FEE; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB CERTIFICATION FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB APPTMENT OF SUCCESSOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less