This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 11/16/2022 at 04:52:25 (UTC).

HABTOM REZENE GHEBRERUFAEL VS. JUAN GARCIAAMAZON LOGISTICS, INC , D/B/A, FIRST IN CARGO,LLC

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 HABTOM REZENE GHEBRERUFAEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUAN GARCIAAMAZON LOGISTICS, INC , D/B/A, FIRST IN CARGO,LLC. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WONG, TODD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0098

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

WONG, TODD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REZENE GHEBRERUFAEL, HABTOM

Defendants

AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC , D/B/A, FIRST IN CARGO,LLC

GARCIA, JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

De La Garza, Frank Scott

Defendant Attorney

CHAMBERLAIN, DAVID E.

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

06/10/2021 - DSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

PLD:CV ANSWER

02/19/2021 - PLD:CV ANSWER

PLD:CV AMENDED ANSWER

03/29/2021 - PLD:CV AMENDED ANSWER

PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

04/28/2021 - PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

PLD:CV ANSWER

03/05/2021 - PLD:CV ANSWER

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/26/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

NTC:CV INTENT TO TAKE DEPO

04/28/2021 - NTC:CV INTENT TO TAKE DEPO

DSP:CV OCC LICENSE SIGNED

04/28/2021 - DSP:CV OCC LICENSE SIGNED

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

03/09/2021 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

Civil Document - Public

CV County Clerk Public Documents

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • DispositionAgreed Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketTWONG:CV:AGREED JUDG SIGNED; Comment: CJ/SUBMISSION DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DispositionFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORD:CV FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPOSITION; Comment: PO-CARE MEDIAL CENTER (MEDICAL) Adjmt Amount: 329.10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DispositionAll Other Dispositions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDSP:CV OCCUPATIONAL LICENSE SIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC:CV INTENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC:CV FILING RECORDS AND AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRET:CV CITATION WITH AFFIDAVIT SERVED; Party: Defendant AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC , D/B/A, FIRST IN CARGO,LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV ANSWER; Party: Defendant AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC , D/B/A, FIRST IN CARGO,LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRET:CV CITATION WITH AFFIDAVIT SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION; Party: Defendant AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC , D/B/A, FIRST IN CARGO,LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION; Party: Defendant GARCIA, JUAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketISS:CV CITATION; Comment: EMAILED TO service@atxprocess.com; Party: Defendant AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC , D/B/A, FIRST IN CARGO,LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketISS:CV CITATION; Comment: EMAILED TO service@atxprocess.com; Party: Defendant GARCIA, JUAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Logistics Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMBERLAIN DAVID E.