This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 09/24/2019 at 17:38:14 (UTC).

RELIANCE RETAIL, LLC D/B/A RETAIL SOLUTIONS VS RESTCORP CASUAL, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 RELIANCE RETAIL, LLC D/B/A RETAIL SOLUTIONS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RESTCORP CASUAL, LLC. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0795

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RELIANCE RETAIL, LLC D/B/A RETAIL SOLUTIONS

Defendant

RESTCORP CASUAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETTERSON ELIZABETH ANN

 

Court Documents

MSC:CV REQUEST FOR ABSTRACT

05/15/2019 - MSC:CV REQUEST FOR ABSTRACT

MSC:CV REQUEST FOR ABSTRACT

03/20/2019 - MSC:CV REQUEST FOR ABSTRACT

DSP:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

03/13/2019 - DSP:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOT:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

03/07/2019 - MOT:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

02/07/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/29/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

01/28/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/25/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • ISS:CV ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • PMT:CV ABSTRACT OF JDGMNT ISS; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • MSC:CV REQUEST FOR ABSTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • ASM:CV ABSTRACT OF JDGMNT ISS; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • PMT:CV ABSTRACT OF JDGMNT ISS; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • MSC:CV REQUEST FOR ABSTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • ASM:CV ABSTRACT OF JDGMNT ISS; Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • ISS:CV NOTICE JUDG RULE 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DSP:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • TWONG:CV DEFAULT JDG SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • MOT:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • ISS:CV CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less