This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/02/2020 at 18:18:16 (UTC).

REINELT ANNA MAUREEN, REINELT JACK G. Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 REINELT ANNA MAUREEN, REINELT JACK G was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0241

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

REINELT JACK G.

Not Classified By Court

REINELT ANNA MAUREEN

Other

PROBATE RECOVERY SYSTEMS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

STREIT TANYA KATHERINE SMITH

 

Court Documents

MSC:PB REQ TO CLRK FOR ISSUANC

11/11/2019 - MSC:PB REQ TO CLRK FOR ISSUANC

DSC:ANSWER TO DEPO ON WRIT QUE

08/20/2019 - DSC:ANSWER TO DEPO ON WRIT QUE

PLD:PB PLEADING OR MOTION

06/12/2019 - PLD:PB PLEADING OR MOTION

PLD:PB APPOINTMENT OF R/A

06/05/2019 - PLD:PB APPOINTMENT OF R/A

MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

05/17/2019 - MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

NTC:PB INTENT TO TAKE DEPO

05/17/2019 - NTC:PB INTENT TO TAKE DEPO

PLD:PB CONSENT TO PROBATE

04/16/2019 - PLD:PB CONSENT TO PROBATE

PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

02/05/2019 - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

02/01/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

01/08/2020 - MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

PLD:PB CLAIM

12/23/2019 - PLD:PB CLAIM

PLD:PB PROOF SERV NOT CREDITOR

12/13/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF SERV NOT CREDITOR

PLD:PB OATH

11/11/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

11/08/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

PLD:PB CONSENT TO PROBATE

04/16/2019 - PLD:PB CONSENT TO PROBATE

PLD:PB WILL

02/05/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/31/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

01/31/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER SECTION 308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER SECTION 308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB UNALLOWED CLAIM; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:PB CLAIM LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less