This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/20/2020 at 06:38:42 (UTC).

REBOLLOSO LINDA VS URREGO ANDRES FELIPE

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 REBOLLOSO LINDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against URREGO ANDRES FELIPE. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0153

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REBOLLOSO LINDA

Defendants

URREGO ANDRES FELIPE

LAPASO JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKINNEY JESSICA NICOLE

Defendant Attorney

WEITZEL TRAVIS DALE

 

Court Documents

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

03/02/2020 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

PLD:CV AMENDED PETITION

02/28/2020 - PLD:CV AMENDED PETITION

PLD:CV AMENDED PETITION

09/05/2019 - PLD:CV AMENDED PETITION

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

07/22/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

ORD:CV SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

06/27/2019 - ORD:CV SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/07/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/07/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/07/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/07/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

03/13/2020 - PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

03/12/2020 - PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

MSC:CV AFFID MEDICAL BILLING

12/16/2019 - MSC:CV AFFID MEDICAL BILLING

PLD:CV AMENDED ANSWER

09/04/2019 - PLD:CV AMENDED ANSWER

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

06/18/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: DSP:CV ORDER OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO; Amount: $477.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: TWONG:CV NON SUIT ORD SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO; Amount: $452.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV COPY FEE CLERK MAKES; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV COPY FEE CLERK MAKES; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV COPY FEE CLERK MAKES; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV JURY DEMAND FEE; Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CV JURY DEMAND FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less