This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/21/2020 at 06:24:08 (UTC).

RAMIREZ ROBERT, RAMIREZ TOMMIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 RAMIREZ ROBERT, RAMIREZ TOMMIE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0090

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

RAMIREZ ROBERT

Not Classified By Court

RAMIREZ TOMMIE

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB WILL

01/17/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

05/21/2019 - PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

02/26/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB WILL

01/17/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/17/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

01/15/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

01/15/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

01/15/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

01/15/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

01/15/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

01/15/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

04/15/2019 - PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

04/15/2019 - NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

02/26/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

PLD:PB OATH

02/26/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

PLD:PB AMENDED APPLICATION

02/14/2019 - PLD:PB AMENDED APPLICATION

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB JUDGE SIG FOR LETTERS; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Amount: $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ADMIN OF OATH; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 10; Event Description: PLD:PB OATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less