This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 04/01/2020 at 12:37:10 (UTC).

QUISENBERRY KATHLEEN VS RUEB TUPA JILL ANNE

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 QUISENBERRY KATHLEEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RUEB TUPA JILL ANNE. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1070

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUISENBERRY KATHLEEN

Defendant

RUEB TUPA JILL ANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTGOMERY TAYLOR SHELTON

Defendant Attorney

BOSKY STEPHEN WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

11/13/2019 - DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

MOT:CV DISMISS

11/01/2019 - MOT:CV DISMISS

PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

08/27/2019 - PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

PLD:CV DESIG OF LEAD COUNSEL

06/12/2019 - PLD:CV DESIG OF LEAD COUNSEL

PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

06/12/2019 - PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

06/05/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

02/04/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

02/04/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

PLD:CV ANSWER

02/28/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/19/2019 - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

RET:CV CITATION RET UNSERVED

02/19/2019 - RET:CV CITATION RET UNSERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

02/04/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

02/04/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: JURY TRIAL; Jury: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: PRETRIAL MOTIONS; Duration: 30 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: TWONG:DISMISS ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MOT:CV DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO; Amount: $432.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV DESIG OF LEAD COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV CERTIFICATION DEPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV CITATION RET UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV JURY DEMAND FEE; Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CV JURY DEMAND FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less