This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 07:19:48 (UTC).

PULIDO ADRIENNE, PULIDO ALEXANDRO Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 PULIDO ADRIENNE, PULIDO ALEXANDRO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0338

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicants

PULIDO BIANCA

PULIDO ALEXANDRO

PULIDO RICARDO

PULIDO ADRIENNE

Not Classified By Court

PULIDO IGNACIO JR

 

Court Documents

ORD:SEA APPRV OFF CRT DOCKET

04/30/2019 - ORD:SEA APPRV OFF CRT DOCKET

PLD:PB DOCUMENT FILING

04/26/2019 - PLD:PB DOCUMENT FILING

PLD:PB AMENDED APPLICATION

04/10/2019 - PLD:PB AMENDED APPLICATION

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

02/15/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/12/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

02/12/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

OPN:PB SMALL ESTATE AFFIDAVIT

02/12/2019 - OPN:PB SMALL ESTATE AFFIDAVIT

MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

02/12/2019 - MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB CERTIFICATION FEE; Amount: $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB CERTIFICATION FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:SEA APPRV OFF CRT DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB DOCUMENT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB AMENDED APPLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB SMALL ESTATE AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $302.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:PB POSTED NTC GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: OPN:PB SMALL ESTATE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: NOTE:SMALL ESTATES SENT TO CRT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB SMALL ESTATE AFFIDAVIT; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $302.00

    Read MoreRead Less