This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/30/2020 at 09:44:24 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS LUNA AMBER

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUNA AMBER. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0828

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

LUNA AMBER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KETTLER JOHN EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

JACOBSON IRMA DE JESUS MENDOZA

 

Court Documents

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/28/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

01/28/2019 - MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

01/28/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/28/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

DSP:CV NOTICE OF NON SUIT

06/13/2019 - DSP:CV NOTICE OF NON SUIT

NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

06/07/2019 - NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

PLD:CV RULE 11 AGREEMENT

03/25/2019 - PLD:CV RULE 11 AGREEMENT

NTC:CV OTHER TYPES

03/04/2019 - NTC:CV OTHER TYPES

PLD:CV ANSWER

02/25/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

02/11/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/28/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

01/28/2019 - MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

01/28/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/28/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSP:CV NOTICE OF NON SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: TWONG:CV NON SUIT ORD SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV RULE 11 AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV OTHER TYPES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV ANSWER; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less