This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/21/2023 at 18:00:32 (UTC).

Performance Food Group, Inc., Plaintiff VS. 4Fishtales, LLC DBA FISH TALES, Scott Harpring, Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 Performance Food Group, Inc , Plaintiff filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 4Fishtales, LLC DBA FISH TALES, Scott Harpring, Defendant. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WONG, TODD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0005

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

WONG, TODD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Performance Food Group, Inc.

Defendants

4Fishtales, LLC DBA FISH TALES

Harpring, Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bill Malone, Jr.

 

Court Documents

PUBLIC - E-Filed Petition

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - E-Filed Petition

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - MOT:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ORD:CV PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT CT1

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - PLD:CV CERTIFICATION OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - MSC:CV AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - PLD:CV MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV NOTICE JUDGMENT RULE 306

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV NOTICE JUDGMENT RULE 306

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV NOTICE JUDGMENT RULE 306

CV County Clerk Public Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • DispositionDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISS:CV NOTICE JUDGMENT RULE 306

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDSP:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketTWONG:JUDGE'S ORDER; Comment: Default Judgment/Odyssey Queue/CJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV MILITARY AFFIDAVIT; Comment: Military Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMSC:CV AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES; Comment: Fee Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV CERTIFICATION OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS; Comment: Certificate of Last Known Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORD:CV PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT CT1; Comment: Proposed Order for Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOT:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: Motion for Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Comment: Return of Service - Scott

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Comment: Return of Service - LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketISS:CV CITATION; Comment: BILL@BILLMALONELAW.COM; Party: Defendant 4Fishtales, LLC DBA FISH TALES; Party: Defendant Harpring, Scott

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filed Petition; Comment: Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filed Petition; Comment: Civil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketOPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less