This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 06/20/2020 at 01:25:34 (UTC).

PELLA PRODUCTS OF SOUTH TEXAS, LTD VS MARINO ANTHONY Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 PELLA PRODUCTS OF SOUTH TEXAS, LTD filed an Other lawsuit against MARINO ANTHONY. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2552

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PELLA PRODUCTS OF SOUTH TEXAS, LTD

Defendants

MOW PARTNERS, LLC

MARINO ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENBLUM RICHARD E.

Defendant Attorney

BILLICK EDWARD JASON

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV ORDER OF NONSUIT

08/14/2019 - DSP:CV ORDER OF NONSUIT

DSP:CV NOTICE OF NON SUIT

08/02/2019 - DSP:CV NOTICE OF NON SUIT

PLD:CV ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

06/07/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

03/22/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

03/27/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

03/27/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

03/22/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: TWONG:NONSUIT ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSP:CV ORDER OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV COUNTERCLAIM FILING; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV COUNTERCLAIM FILING; Party Type: DF1; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less