This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/07/2020 at 14:36:14 (UTC).

PALLIDA, L.L.C., SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF DEDEKA, L.L.C

Case Summary

On 03/07/2019 PALLIDA, L L C , SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF DEDEKA, L L C was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2089

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Defendant

GEORGI JEFF

Garnishor

PALLIDA, L.L.C., SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF DEDEKA, L.L.C

Garnishee

WELLS FARGO BANK

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV NOTICE OF NON SUIT

05/07/2019 - DSP:CV NOTICE OF NON SUIT

NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

04/30/2019 - NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

03/07/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

03/07/2019 - MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

OPN:CV APPLICATION FILED

03/07/2019 - OPN:CV APPLICATION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Party Type: GS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSP:CV NOTICE OF NON SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: VJ:CV VISITING JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSB:FEE OVERPAYMENTS; Party Type: GR1; Amount: $11.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:OVERPAYMENT/REFUND EVENT; Amount: $11.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV POSTJUDG GARNISHMENT; Party Type: GS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV GARNISHMENT FILING FEE; Amount: $247.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: GR1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV GARNISHMENT FILING FEE; Party Type: GR1; Amount: $247.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: OPN:CV APPLICATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less