This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/20/2020 at 06:22:47 (UTC).

NANCARROW DAVID, NANCARROW MARY COPPLE Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 NANCARROW DAVID, NANCARROW MARY COPPLE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0099

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

NANCARROW DAVID

Applicant

NANCARROW MARY COPPLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

NICKERSON JULIA ASHMORE

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB WILL

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/16/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

01/16/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

01/16/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

01/16/2019 - MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

01/16/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB WILL

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

01/16/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

01/16/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

01/16/2019 - MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

01/16/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

MSC:PB WAIVER SECTION 308

03/01/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER SECTION 308

PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

03/01/2019 - PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

02/26/2019 - NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

02/15/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

02/15/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER SECTION 308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:PB OATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB JUDGE SIG FOR LETTERS; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less