This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/20/2020 at 10:20:14 (UTC).

MONCADA LUIS VS SMITH IVORY DANA

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 MONCADA LUIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SMITH IVORY DANA. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0626

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONCADA LUIS

Defendant

SMITH IVORY DANA

Intervenor

LORENZ & LORENZ LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FRETEL CHRISTOPHER GEORGE

Intervenor Attorney

SHULER PETER JAMES

 

Court Documents

MOT:CV DISMISS

08/27/2019 - MOT:CV DISMISS

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/22/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/22/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

ORD:CV WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

04/16/2019 - ORD:CV WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

PLD:CV INTERPLEADER

04/16/2019 - PLD:CV INTERPLEADER

PLD:CV ANSWER

03/12/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

01/29/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/22/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/22/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

09/30/2019 - DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NTC:CV HEARING

09/17/2019 - NTC:CV HEARING

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

08/27/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

01/29/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

NTC:CV HEARING

03/26/2019 - NTC:CV HEARING

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

03/25/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

NTC:CV HEARING

03/25/2019 - NTC:CV HEARING

MOT:CV MOTION TO WITHDRAW

03/25/2019 - MOT:CV MOTION TO WITHDRAW

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

03/12/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: MTN TO DISMISS; Court Name: COUNTY COURT AT LAW #2; Attorney: FRETEL CHRISTOPHER GEORGE; Duration: 30 Minutes; Jury: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: EMS:JUDGE'S ORDER:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: MOT:CV DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV INTERPLEADER FILING FEE; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ORD:CV WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV INTERPLEADER

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV JURY DEMAND FEE; Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CV JURY DEMAND FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less