Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/09/2020 at 02:39:09 (UTC).

MEXICANO MARIA, PLUMMER CLARENCE III Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 MEXICANO MARIA, PLUMMER CLARENCE III was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6450

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

PLUMMER CLARENCE III

Applicant

MEXICANO MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

TRISTAN LIZBETH

 

Court Documents

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

08/13/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

08/16/2019 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

08/06/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

08/06/2019 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

08/05/2019 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DM:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: EMS:JUDGE'S ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV CIT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRISTAN LIZBETH