This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 07:34:46 (UTC).

MCCRUMMEN CLAIRE ELIZABETH, MCCRUMMEN MARIAN MARLEY Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 MCCRUMMEN CLAIRE ELIZABETH, MCCRUMMEN MARIAN MARLEY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0384

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

MCCRUMMEN CLAIRE ELIZABETH

Not Classified By Court

MCCRUMMEN MARIAN MARLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

CARNES DONALD F.

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

06/06/2019 - PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

04/12/2019 - PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

04/09/2019 - NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

04/02/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:PB OATH

04/02/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

04/02/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

MSC:PB WAIVER OF RT TO LETTERS

02/25/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF RT TO LETTERS

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

02/22/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB WILL

02/22/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

02/22/2019 - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/21/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

02/20/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

02/20/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

02/20/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB JUDGE SIG FOR LETTERS; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ADMIN OF OATH; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: PLD:PB OATH; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less