Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/18/2021 at 04:21:26 (UTC).

MARIN GILBERT, MARTINEZ MONTEMAYOR ROXANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 MARIN GILBERT, MARTINEZ MONTEMAYOR ROXANN was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0973

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

MARIN GILBERT

Applicant

MARTINEZ MONTEMAYOR ROXANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

CISNEROS LAUREN HARTMAN

 

Court Documents

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

03/08/2021 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

03/19/2021 - DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

03/12/2021 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

03/12/2021 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

03/08/2021 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

03/08/2021 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

03/08/2021 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

02/26/2021 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/26/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/26/2021 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

02/26/2021 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

02/26/2021 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 11; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO DPS; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 10; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO DPS; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: PLD:CV COP SENT TO APPLICANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: PLD:CV COPY TO DAYCARE/SCHOOL; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: PLD:CV COPY TO DAYCARE/SCHOOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO LAW ENFO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO DPS; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:CV COP SENT TO APPLICANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: VJ:CV VISITING JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 10; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:COVID APP FOR PO/TRO COMB; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: TWONG:JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:COVID APP FOR PO/TRO COMB; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: TWONG:JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CISNEROS LAUREN HARTMAN