This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 10/24/2020 at 08:04:30 (UTC).

MANZ MARY, WEISE HERMAN VINCENT Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 MANZ MARY, WEISE HERMAN VINCENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1910

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

MANZ MARY

Not Classified By Court

WEISE HERMAN VINCENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

ASHWORTH KAREN GRACE

Not Classified By Court Attorney

WILSON TODD ANDREW

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB CIT BY PUBLIC RET FILED

10/12/2020 - PLD:PB CIT BY PUBLIC RET FILED

MSC:PB OCA/CIT BY PUB POSTED

10/06/2020 - MSC:PB OCA/CIT BY PUB POSTED

PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

09/25/2020 - PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

09/28/2020 - ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

PLD:PB NOTICE RETURNED POSTED

09/25/2020 - PLD:PB NOTICE RETURNED POSTED

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

09/24/2020 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

09/24/2020 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

09/24/2020 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

OPN:PB APPL APPT AD DETER HEIR

09/24/2020 - OPN:PB APPL APPT AD DETER HEIR

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB CIT BY PUBLIC RET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:PB OCA/CIT BY PUB POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:PB SENT TO VOTERS REG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB APPT ATTY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB REPORT CRT APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB NOTICE RETURNED POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ATTY AD LITEM; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 10; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: ISS:PB CIT PUBLICATION AFTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: ISS:PB POSTED NTC GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: OPN:PB APPL APPT AD DETER HEIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ASM:PB ATTY AD LITEM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ASM:CONSTABLE SERVICE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less