This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 06:22:41 (UTC).

MACKEY RONALD KEITH, RUSSELL CHELSEY Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 MACKEY RONALD KEITH, RUSSELL CHELSEY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0104

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

RUSSELL CHELSEY

Not Classified By Court

MACKEY RONALD KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

RUSSELL WELDON RAY

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB EXTEND TIME FILE INVENT

05/16/2019 - PLD:PB EXTEND TIME FILE INVENT

NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

03/19/2019 - NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

01/24/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

01/22/2019 - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:PB WILL

01/22/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/17/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

01/16/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

01/16/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

07/03/2019 - PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

01/24/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

01/22/2019 - PLD:PB LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:PB WILL

01/22/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

05/16/2019 - MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

05/15/2019 - PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

04/16/2019 - MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

PLD:PB OATH

02/15/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB AFFD IN LIEU OF INVENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PC1:DEC/DA/GDN(55)INV EXT(+DD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB APPV EXT TIME FILE INVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:PB EXTEND TIME FILE INVENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB ATTY CERT OF 308A NTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSC:PB WAIVER OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less