Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/30/2020 at 09:26:09 (UTC).

LUGO JOHN, PARRA OLIVEROS ANA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 LUGO JOHN, PARRA OLIVEROS ANA was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0782

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

LUGO JOHN

Applicant

PARRA OLIVEROS ANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

RILEY HILARY LYNN

 

Court Documents

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

01/31/2019 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

01/31/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/28/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

01/28/2019 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

01/25/2019 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

02/08/2019 - DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

RET:CV GEN NTC RETURNED SERVED

02/13/2019 - RET:CV GEN NTC RETURNED SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/08/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

02/08/2019 - DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

01/31/2019 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

01/31/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/28/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

01/28/2019 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

01/25/2019 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV GEN NTC RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 10; Event Description: DSP:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO APD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO DPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: PLD:CV COPY TO DAYCARE/SCHOOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: PLD:CV COP SENT TO APPLICANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV GENERAL NOTICE PROT ORD; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DM:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: EMS:JUDGE'S ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CIT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY HILARY LYNN